Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2177 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19980 Week
» 72996 Month
» 192523 Year
» 3219376 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4303 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
British Railways |
44303 |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 10/1926 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1963 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4303 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44303 |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44303 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|