Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 492 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14535 Week
» 79489 Month
» 282153 Year
» 3309006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4305 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
British Railways |
44305 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 10/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/04/1965 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/08/1952 |
Bangor MPD |
Among the 32 locomotives shedded at 6H, are Webb 2-4-2T 46604 an 46701: 'Coal tank' 58903 and 'Cauliflower' 58375. The balance is divided between light 2-6-2Ts, three 'class 5' 4-6-0's, one Stanier 2-6-2T (40132): 2-6-4Ts, three ex-L47 0-6-0's and two '4F' 0-6-0's (44445 and 44305). The last two engines have been on Bangor Shed strength for seven years. |
SLS/195211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4305 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44305 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44305 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|