Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2663 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16069 Week
» 69085 Month
» 188612 Year
» 3215465 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4306 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
British Railways |
44306 |
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 10/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/11/1959 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
12C |
Durran Hill (Carlisle) |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
11A |
Carnforth |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
30/05/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4306 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
02/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44306 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Durran Hill (Carlisle) (12C) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Durran Hill (Carlisle) (12C) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44306 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|