Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 603 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3529 Week
» 5267 Month
» 132710 Year
» 1798086 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4334 m/e 10/1926
British Railways 44334 w/e 17/03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Kerr Stuart
To Service During 10/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/06/1965
Service Life 38 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1926
19A   Sheffield Grimesthorpe on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17D   Rowsley 4w/e 17/07/1954
17A   Derby 4w/e 01/01/1955
17C   Rowsley w/e 14/01/1961
16C   Derby w/e 09/05/1964
15E   Coalville w/e 27/06/1964
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 19/12/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 19/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17D Rowsley 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 16C Derby 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 15E Coalville 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 09/01/1965
WDN   w/e 19/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/12/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. SLS/196001
15/04/1962 Horwich Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 42789, 48670, LYR 1008, D4127, uM65437, uM77158, uM28580, u28930, u29154, u29241, u29653, u29830 M. Light Repair Shop: 44061, D2388. Test House: 47550, 11305. Yard: 43017, 44334, 47402/29, 48684, 11324/68, uM28331, u29560, u29881 M. Erecting Shop: 42708/32, 42828, 42979, 43960, 44074, 44266, 44364/79, 44468, 44554, 48123/38/61, 48295, 48403, 48715 Wren, 12001/9/19/36/49/63/71, D4128-30 (Engines and body sides), D4131/2 (Engines on frames), D4133/4 (frames only). Outside Erecting Shop: 42896, 42959, 44003, 48257, 48321, D117. Car Shop: uM28221, u28497, u28690, u29022, u29289, u29720/2 M. Scrap Road: NIL. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1926 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4334
Built at Kerr Stuart
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A)    
17/03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 44334    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17D)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
09/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Coalville (15E)    
19/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
19/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 44334    
10/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev