Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2961 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16367 Week
» 69383 Month
» 188910 Year
» 3215763 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4439 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
44439 |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 12/1927 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/04/1964 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4439 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44439 |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12F) |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44439 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|