Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 364 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18167 Week
» 71183 Month
» 190710 Year
» 3217563 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4443 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
44443 |
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 12/1927 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/08/1965 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1927 |
1C |
|
Watford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
11B |
|
Barrow in Furness |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
w/e |
16/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4443 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Watford (1C) |
|
|
13/05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44443 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
07/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44443 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|