Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 18 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4645 Week
» 6383 Month
» 133826 Year
» 1799202 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4445 m/e 12/1927
British Railways 44445 w/e 08/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 12/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/06/1963
Service Life 35 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1927
7B   Bangor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24L   Carnforth w/e 20/06/1959
6B   Mold Junction w/e 05/12/1959
8C   Speke Junction w/e 11/06/1960
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 17/09/1960
24L   Carnforth w/e 28/10/1961
5B   Crewe South w/e 07/07/1962
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 10/11/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 15/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 01/12/1962
WDN   w/e 15/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/08/1952 Bangor MPD Among the 32 locomotives shedded at 6H, are Webb 2-4-2T 46604 an 46701: 'Coal tank' 58903 and 'Cauliflower' 58375. The balance is divided between light 2-6-2Ts, three 'class 5' 4-6-0's, one Stanier 2-6-2T (40132): 2-6-4Ts, three ex-L47 0-6-0's and two '4F' 0-6-0's (44445 and 44305). The last two engines have been on Bangor Shed strength for seven years. SLS/195211

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4445
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B)    
08/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44445    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
11/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
28/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
10/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
15/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 44445    
08/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev