Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2089 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19892 Week
» 72908 Month
» 192435 Year
» 3219288 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4447 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
British Railways |
44447 |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 01/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/07/1963 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1928 |
2B |
|
Bletchley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
12E |
|
Barrow in Furness |
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4447 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44447 |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44447 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|