Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2041 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15447 Week
» 68463 Month
» 187990 Year
» 3214843 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4451 |
m/e |
02/1928 |
British Railways |
44451 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 02/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/12/1965 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4451 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44451 |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
23/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
18/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44451 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|