Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 308 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2009 Week
» 10124 Month
» 137567 Year
» 1802943 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4462 m/e 05/1928
British Railways 44462 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 05/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/11/1965
Service Life 37 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1928
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25D   Mirfield 4w/e 31/12/1950
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 23/04/1955
25D   Mirfield 8w/e 16/07/1955
27E   Walton on the Hill m/e 16/06/1956
17B   Burton w/e 20/01/1962
27E   Walton on the Hill w/e 27/01/1962
10H   Lower Darwen w/e 04/01/1964
10G   Skipton w/e 07/11/1964
12D   Workington w/e 20/03/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 13/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23B Aintree w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 25D Mirfield m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 25A Wakefield 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 25D Mirfield 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 10H Lower Darwen 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 10G Skipton 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 12D Workington 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 13/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4462
Built at Horwich Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
27/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44462    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
20/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
04/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
20/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
13/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 44462    
02/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev