Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 348 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14391 Week
» 79345 Month
» 282009 Year
» 3308862 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4469 |
m/e |
05/1928 |
British Railways |
44469 |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
St. Rollox Works |
To Service |
During 05/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/03/1963 |
Service Life |
34 yrs , 11 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24L |
Carnforth |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4469 Built at St. Rollox Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tebay (11E) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44469 |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
30/03/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44469 |
|
|
07/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|