Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2006 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15412 Week
» 68428 Month
» 187955 Year
» 3214808 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4474 |
m/e |
07/1928 |
British Railways |
44474 |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
St. Rollox Works |
To Service |
During 07/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 21/12/1961 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4474 Built at St. Rollox Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44474 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
21/12/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44474 |
|
|
03/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|