Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4481 m/e 12/1927
British Railways 44481 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 12/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/11/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1927
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27E   Walton on the Hill 4w/e 31/12/1950
9D   Newton Heath w/e 21/12/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 28/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   w/e 28/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/12/1961 Horwich Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D4112 (finished), D4113/4 (engines in), D4115/6 (frames), 12004/20/7, 42702/17, 42827, 42953/82, 43007/52, 43856, 43976, 44056/146/277, 44342/52/67/73, 44602, 48136/64, 48634, 48741, 76051/79, Wren. Car Erecting Shop: uM28219/348/590, uM29023/249/575/655/723. Casual Repair Shop: 43009, 48522/36, 48717. Diesel Test House: 12014. Works Yard: 40132, 42703/63, 42862/3, 42983, 44152, 44481, 44564, 48201, 48333/8, 48423, 48558, 48770, uM28321M, uM29555M-both damaged. Paint Shop: D4111 (new), 42799, uM28394, uM29141, uM29836, LYR 1008, FR 3. Scrap Yard: 51419, 51537 (being cut up), 42893 (remains). Works Shunters: 47402/29, 11304/5/24/68. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4481
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
04/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44481    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
28/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44481    
02/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev