Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 489 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3415 Week
» 5153 Month
» 132596 Year
» 1797972 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4486 m/e 12/1927
British Railways 44486 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 12/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/01/1965
Service Life 37 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1927
25C   Goole on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24A   Accrington w/e 02/10/1948
26G   Belle Vue 4w/e 07/10/1950
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 01/12/1956
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/11/1963
10G   Skipton w/e 30/11/1963
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 25/01/1964
9G   Gorton w/e 04/04/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 23/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24A Accrington w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 26G Belle Vue w/e 07/10/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 10G Skipton 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 04/04/1964
WDN   w/e 23/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4486
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Goole (25C)    
02/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
19/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44486    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
04/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
23/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 44486    
04/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev