Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 853 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18656 Week
» 71672 Month
» 191199 Year
» 3218052 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4492 |
m/e |
10/1927 |
British Railways |
44492 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4492 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44492 |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
08/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coalville (15E) |
|
|
05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44492 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|