Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3435 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16841 Week
» 69857 Month
» 189384 Year
» 3216237 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4504 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
British Railways |
44504 |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
5w/e |
02/03/1946 |
LOAN |
6H |
Bangor |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
6H |
Bangor |
4w/e |
27/02/1960 |
ALLOC |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
5w/e |
02/07/1960 |
ALLOC |
6H |
Bangor |
4w/e |
24/09/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4504 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44504 |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
11/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
10/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44504 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|