|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/03/1961 | Horwich Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: D3925, 40146, 42723/79, 42890, 43880, 44126, 44455, 44512/44, 48118/64, 48507, 48608, 48742/56, 51229, 51441/96, 52270, 52415. Scrap Yard: 50746, 52201/44, 52355. Erecting Shop: D3932-6, D4011/2, 12004/5/46, 42822/4/67/70, 42959/69/75/84, 43000/19, 44099, 44113/97, 44446, 44595, 48056, 48113, 48332, 48454, 48513, 48640/76, 48708, 76077/83, Car Shop: uM28306/81M, uM28586M. Paint Shop: 13247, uM28330M, and the usual preserved engines; Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1928 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4512 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | |||
19/08/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44512 | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) | ||
24/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (3A) | ||
09/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
16/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
06/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (21B) | ||
14/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
01/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44512 | ||
11/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |