Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 292 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1993 Week
» 10108 Month
» 137551 Year
» 1802927 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4514 m/e 06/1928
British Railways 44514 w/e 20/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 06/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/09/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1965 at Cohens (Ickles)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1928
3E   Monument Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21D   Aston w/e 10/02/1962
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/07/1962
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 06/07/1963
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 08/02/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 26/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21D Aston 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   w/e 26/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/12/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. SLS/196001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4514
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Monument Lane (3E)    
20/08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44514    
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
06/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
08/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
26/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44514    
03/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Ickles    

prev prev