Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 585 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3511 Week
» 5249 Month
» 132692 Year
» 1798068 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4517 m/e 07/1928
British Railways 44517 w/e 08/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 07/1928
Withdrawal During 10/1963
Service Life 35 yrs , 3 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1928
3D   Aston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5D   Stoke 4w/e 07/09/1957
5D   Stoke 8w/e 05/10/1957
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/07/1962
5D   Stoke w/e 10/11/1962
17A   Derby w/e 01/12/1962
17C   Rowsley w/e 22/06/1963
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 07/09/1957
EXLOAN 3D Aston 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 01/12/1962
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/04/1948 Horwich Works On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4517
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aston (3D)    
08/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44517    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
10/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
01/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 44517    
01/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev