|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/01/1961 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1928 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4540 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Rowsley (17D) | ||
15/01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44540 | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
07/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bedford (14E) | ||
14/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) | ||
02/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) | ||
16/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44540 | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |