Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 340 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2041 Week
» 10156 Month
» 137599 Year
» 1802975 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4541 m/e 10/1928
British Railways 44541 w/e 30/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 10/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/11/1963
Service Life 35 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1928
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27E   Walton on the Hill 4w/e 31/12/1950
17B   Burton 4w/e 14/06/1958
18A   Toton w/e 01/06/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 09/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23B Aintree w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 17B Burton 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   w/e 09/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4541
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
30/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44541    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
09/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 44541    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev