|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/09/1961 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4572 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) | ||
02/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44572 | ||
26/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (20H) | ||
18/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (16B) | ||
20/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Coalville (17C) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) | ||
25/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
16/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
09/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) | ||
19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44572 | ||
11/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |