Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 602 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 5266 Month
» 132709 Year
» 1798085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4578 m/e 04/1939
British Railways 44578 w/e 22/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 04/1939
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/02/1964
Service Life 24 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1939
16A   Nottingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17A   Derby w/e 18/11/1961
14E   Bedford w/e 07/04/1962
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 22/06/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 15/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 14E Bedford 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 15/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 Derby Works Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. SLS/195006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1939 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4578
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
22/04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 44578    
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
07/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (14E)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
15/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44578    
09/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev