Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4589 m/e 09/1939
British Railways 44589 w/e 07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 09/1939
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/11/1964
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1939
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17A   Derby 4w/e 06/10/1956
21A   Saltley w/e 06/12/1958
27F   Brunswick w/e 10/01/1959
8C   Speke Junction w/e 16/09/1961
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 04/11/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 27F Brunswick 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   w/e 14/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/07/1951 Derby Works During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. SLS/195109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1939 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4589
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
07/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44589    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
06/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (27F)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
14/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44589    
04/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev