Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2635 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16041 Week
» 69057 Month
» 188584 Year
» 3215437 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1023 |
m/e |
11/1889 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12088 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52088 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
3 |
Works Number |
21 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1889 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/06/1951 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
10C |
Patricroft |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1911 |
Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1889 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1023 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 21 |
|
|
12/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12088 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52088 |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52088 |
|
|