Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 971 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14377 Week
» 67393 Month
» 186920 Year
» 3213773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1031 |
m/e |
02/1890 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12094 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52094 |
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
3 |
Works Number |
29 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1890 |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 18/05/1957 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1890 |
23B |
|
Aintree |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
26D |
|
Bury |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
26D |
Bury |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1913 |
Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1031 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 29 |
|
|
02/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12094 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B) |
|
|
05/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52094 |
|
|
29/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
05/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52094 |
|
|