Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 323 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2024 Week
» 10139 Month
» 137582 Year
» 1802958 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1032 m/e 02/1890
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12095 y/e 1924
British Railways 52095 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 3
Works Number 30
To Service During 02/1890
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/11/1959
Service Life 69 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1890
20D   Normanton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20C   Royston w/e 06/11/1948
27B   Aintree 3w/e 24/01/1953
27B   Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 21/03/1953
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 29/12/1956
     Withdrawn w/e 28/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20C Royston w/e 06/11/1948
LOAN 27B Aintree 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 29/12/1956
WDN   w/e 28/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1903 Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1890 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1032
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 30
   
09/1903 Modification Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12095    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Normanton (20D)    
05/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52095    
06/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
28/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 52095    
03/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev