Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 796 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18599 Week
» 71615 Month
» 191142 Year
» 3217995 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1061 |
m/e |
11/1890 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12102 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52102 |
w/e |
22/04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
5 |
Works Number |
59 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/01/1953 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1915 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1061 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 59 |
|
|
11/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12102 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52102 |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52102 |
|
|