Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2091 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15497 Week
» 68513 Month
» 188040 Year
» 3214893 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1066 |
m/e |
12/1890 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12107 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52107 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
5 |
Works Number |
64 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/03/1953 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1898 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1066 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 64 |
|
|
03/1898 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12107 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52107 |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
07/03/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52107 |
|
|