Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 28 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4655 Week
» 6393 Month
» 133836 Year
» 1799212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1066 m/e 12/1890
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12107 y/e 1924
British Railways 52107 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 5
Works Number 64
To Service During 12/1890
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/03/1953
Service Life 62 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1890
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/11/1949
7D   Rhyl 4w/e 26/01/1952
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 17/05/1952
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 8w/e 14/06/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 07/03/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 06/12/1947
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 7D Rhyl 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 17/05/1952
WDN   w/e 07/03/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1898 Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1890 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1066
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 64
   
03/1898 Modification Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12107    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
19/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52107    
12/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
07/03/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 52107    

prev prev