Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 129 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17932 Week
» 70948 Month
» 190475 Year
» 3217328 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1067 |
m/e |
12/1890 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12108 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52108 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
5 |
Works Number |
65 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/10/1959 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1913 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/08/1959 |
Ex L.Y.R. locomotives with second-style emblems |
Class 2F 0-6-0ST 11305 (Service Loco.) thus liveried during February, 1958, and Class 3F 0-6-0 52108 similarly painted the following month. |
SLS/195910 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1067 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 65 |
|
|
11/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12108 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C) |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52108 |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52108 |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|