Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 289 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18092 Week
» 71108 Month
» 190635 Year
» 3217488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1084 |
m/e |
05/1891 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12124 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52124 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
6 |
Works Number |
82 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1891 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/01/1954 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
23C |
Southport |
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
26B |
Agecroft |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/01/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1910 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1084 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 82 |
|
|
08/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12124 |
|
|
1940 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (23C) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52124 |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52124 |
|
|