Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 269 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1970 Week
» 10085 Month
» 137528 Year
» 1802904 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1117 m/e 10/1891
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12135 y/e 1924
British Railways 52135 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 8
Works Number 115
To Service During 10/1891
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/11/1959
Service Life 68 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1891
16A   Nottingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree 3w/e 24/01/1953
27B   Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 07/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 27B Aintree 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   w/e 07/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1913 Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1891 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1117
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 115
   
01/1913 Modification Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12135    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
07/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52135    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
07/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 52135    
01/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev