Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 50 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2976 Week
» 4714 Month
» 132157 Year
» 1797533 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1118 m/e 10/1891
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12136 y/e 1924
British Railways 52136 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 8
Works Number 116
To Service During 10/1891
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/08/1957
Service Life 65 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1891
26A   Newton Heath on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26C   Bolton w/e 04/06/1949
27B   Aintree 4w/e 04/10/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 31/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 04/06/1949
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   w/e 31/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1894 Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1891 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1118
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 116
   
03/1894 Modification Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12136    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
11/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52136    
04/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
31/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 52136    
09/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev