Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4062 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17468 Week
» 70484 Month
» 190011 Year
» 3216864 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1120 |
m/e |
11/1891 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12138 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52138 |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
8 |
Works Number |
118 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1891 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/03/1954 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1120 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 118 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12138 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52138 |
|
|
01/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
06/03/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52138 |
|
|