Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1310 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14716 Week
» 67732 Month
» 187259 Year
» 3214112 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1122 |
m/e |
11/1891 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12140 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52140 |
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
8 |
Works Number |
120 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1891 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/07/1960 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1916 |
Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1122 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 120 |
|
|
10/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12140 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52140 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10D) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52140 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|