Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1870 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19673 Week
» 72689 Month
» 192216 Year
» 3219069 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1126 |
m/e |
12/1891 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12143 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52143 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
8 |
Works Number |
124 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/12/1962 |
Service Life |
71 yrs , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1917 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1126 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 124 |
|
|
06/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12143 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (19C) |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52143 |
|
|
09/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52143 |
|
|