Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1853 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15259 Week
» 68275 Month
» 187802 Year
» 3214655 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1144 |
m/e |
03/1892 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12157 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52157 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
9 |
Works Number |
142 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/04/1953 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1910 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1144 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 142 |
|
|
10/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12157 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (19C) |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52157 |
|
|
30/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (23B) |
|
|
29/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52157 |
|
|