Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1148 |
m/e |
04/1892 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12161 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52161 |
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
9 |
Works Number |
146 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/10/1960 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 6 mths , 0 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
HOR |
Horsham |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
EXLOAN |
27C |
Southport |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1912 |
Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1148 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 146 |
|
|
05/1912 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12161 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C) |
|
|
25/03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52161 |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horwich Works (99H) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52161 |
|
|