Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1861 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15267 Week
» 68283 Month
» 187810 Year
» 3214663 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1181 |
m/e |
12/1892 |
Pre Grouping |
6704 |
y/e |
1917 |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway (Revert) |
1181 |
y/e |
1919 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12167 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52167 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
13 |
Works Number |
192 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/03/1956 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1892 |
7D |
|
Rhyl |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
17/03/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
26/07/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/03/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1916 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1181 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 192 |
|
|
05/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1917 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6704 |
|
|
1919 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1181 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12167 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52167 |
|
|
17/03/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52167 |
|
|