Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 335 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2036 Week
» 10151 Month
» 137594 Year
» 1802970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1185 m/e 12/1892
Pre Grouping 6724 m/e 06/1917
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway (Revert) 1185 y/e 1919
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12171 y/e 1924
British Railways 52171 w/e 24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 13
Works Number 196
To Service During 12/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/05/1961
Service Life 68 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1892
24C   Lostock Hall on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree w/e 17/03/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 24/03/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 20/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 17/03/1951
WDN   w/e 20/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1917 Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/05/1946 New LMS Districts New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. SLS/194606
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710
21/04/1948 Horwich Works On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1892 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1185
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 196
   
06/1917 Modification Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted    
06/1917 Renumbered Renumbered to 6724    
1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 1185    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12171    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C)    
24/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52171    
17/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
20/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 52171    
06/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev