Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4039 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17445 Week
» 70461 Month
» 189988 Year
» 3216841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1186 |
m/e |
01/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12172 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52172 |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
13 |
Works Number |
197 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/11/1957 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/11/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1186 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 197 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12172 |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52172 |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52172 |
|
|
12/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|