Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2616 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16022 Week
» 69038 Month
» 188565 Year
» 3215418 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1188 |
m/e |
01/1893 |
Pre Grouping |
6725 |
m/e |
06/1917 |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway (Revert) |
1188 |
y/e |
1919 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12174 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52174 |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
13 |
Works Number |
199 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/09/1954 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/09/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1898 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
06/1917 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1188 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 199 |
|
|
02/1898 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
06/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
06/1917 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6725 |
|
|
1919 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1188 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12174 |
|
|
1940 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
08/07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52174 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52174 |
|
|
10/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|