Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 646 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14052 Week
» 67068 Month
» 186595 Year
» 3213448 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1189 |
m/e |
01/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12175 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52175 |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
13 |
Works Number |
200 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/10/1957 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/10/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1902 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1189 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 200 |
|
|
11/1902 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12175 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52175 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52175 |
|
|
11/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|