Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 250 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1951 Week
» 10066 Month
» 137509 Year
» 1802885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 184 m/e 05/1893
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12196 y/e 1924
British Railways 52196 w/e 22/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 14
Works Number 222
To Service During 05/1893
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/01/1957
Service Life 63 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1893
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 06/10/1951
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 10/11/1951
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 01/12/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23B Aintree w/e 13/09/1947
LOAN 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 10/11/1951
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 01/12/1951
WDN   w/e 05/01/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1915 Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1893 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 184
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 222
   
09/1915 Modification Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12196    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
22/04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 52196    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
10/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
05/01/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 52196    
03/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev