|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/07/1952 | Moor Row MPD | The two regular 'standard class 4' 0-6-0's of this depot are both away for heavy repairs and have been replaced by 44346 from Upperby and 44081 from Penrith-both on loan. 52509 is parted from her tender and jacked up in an undignified position, as if kneeling in prayer, during which time Fitter Mitchell is putting new brasses in her axle boxes. 52494 is at work, as are 52201 an 52285. The four 0-6-0 tanks remain as previously. Moor Row now provides motive power for the evening workmen's passenger train from Sellafield to Barrow, the engine returning with the 21.20 passenger train from Barrow to Corkickle. 44346 has the job at present. |
SLS/195208 |
19/10/1952 | Moor Row MPD | The engine allocation at Moor Row is now reduced to ten locomotives, all of which were on shed on the above date and as follows: 'Standard Class 4 0-6-0's: 44461, 44346 an 44549; Standard Class 3 0-6-0T: 47337, 47390 an 47525; ex-L. &Y . 0-6-0: 52201, 52285 an 52418; ex-F.R. 0-6-0: 52509. | SLS/195212 |
12/03/1961 | Horwich Works (Scrap Yard) | Works Yard: D3925, 40146, 42723/79, 42890, 43880, 44126, 44455, 44512/44, 48118/64, 48507, 48608, 48742/56, 51229, 51441/96, 52270, 52415. Scrap Yard: 50746, 52201/44, 52355. Erecting Shop: D3932-6, D4011/2, 12004/5/46, 42822/4/67/70, 42959/69/75/84, 43000/19, 44099, 44113/97, 44446, 44595, 48056, 48113, 48332, 48454, 48513, 48640/76, 48708, 76077/83, Car Shop: uM28306/81M, uM28586M. Paint Shop: 13247, uM28330M, and the usual preserved engines; Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1893 | To Service | To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 437 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 227 |
||
01/1912 | Modification | Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted | ||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 12201 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Moor Row (12E) | ||
21/08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 52201 | ||
14/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Workington (12D) | ||
16/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
30/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10D) | ||
22/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
19/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) | ||
09/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) | ||
05/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury (26D) | ||
04/02/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 52201 | ||
03/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |