Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 422 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18225 Week
» 71241 Month
» 190768 Year
» 3217621 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
341 |
m/e |
09/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12216 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52216 |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
15 |
Works Number |
245 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Thu 06/11/1958 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 341 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 245 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12216 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52216 |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
29/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
06/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52216 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|