Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 321 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2022 Week
» 10137 Month
» 137580 Year
» 1802956 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 624 m/e 09/1893
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12582 y/e 1924
British Railways 52582 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 15
Works Number 250
To Service During 09/1893
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/05/1955
Service Life 61 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1893
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23C   Southport w/e 17/12/1949
23C   Southport 5w/e 24/12/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 28/05/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 17/12/1949
WDN   w/e 28/05/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1919 Superheated boiler fitted
11/1919 Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/04/1948 Horwich Works On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1893 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 624
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 250
   
11/1919 Modification Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted    
11/1919 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12582    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52582    
17/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
28/05/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 52582    

prev prev