Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1235 |
m/e |
06/1894 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12230 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52230 |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
18 |
Works Number |
301 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1894 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/04/1961 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1918 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1235 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 301 |
|
|
01/1918 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12230 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B) |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52230 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
04/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52230 |
|
|