Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 604 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3530 Week
» 5268 Month
» 132711 Year
» 1798087 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1235 m/e 06/1894
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12230 y/e 1924
British Railways 52230 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 18
Works Number 301
To Service During 06/1894
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/04/1961
Service Life 66 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1894
7B   Bangor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 30/11/1957
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 14/06/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 22/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 30/11/1957
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   w/e 22/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1918 Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1894 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1235
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 301
   
01/1918 Modification Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12230    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B)    
06/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52230    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
04/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    
22/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 52230    

prev prev